This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 05/22/2019 at 14:21:38 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A VS BOSTIC, GUY E Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BOSTIC, GUY E. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

COUNTY OF SANTA ROSA FLORIDA

UNKNOWN TENANT

NEW DIMENSION HOME BUILDERS IN

BOSTIC, GUY E

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

BOSTIC, ROBIN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENZI, EMILIO R.

Defendant Attorney

ANDREWS, ROY VAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

04/29/2019:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

04/29/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED ROBIN L. BOSTIC EMAILED TO ATTY

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ROBIN L. BOSTIC EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED GUY E. BOSTIC EMAILED TO ATTY

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GUY E. BOSTIC EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED COUNTY OF SANTA ROSA FLORIDA EMAILED TO ATTY

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED COUNTY OF SANTA ROSA FLORIDA EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED WELLS FARGO BANK NA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED WELLS FARGO BANK NA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED NEW DIMENSION HOME BUILDERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED NEW DIMENSION HOME BUILDERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

LETTER TO CLERK

10/09/2019:LETTER TO CLERK

COMPLAINT

04/29/2019:COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketANSWER BY SANTA ROSA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROY V ANDREWS UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED ROBIN BOSTIC 5-8-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED GUY BOSTIC 5-8-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED CORP SANTA ROSA COUNTY 5-9-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED NONSERVED NEW DIMENSION HOME BUILDERS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED WELLS FARGO BANK NA 5-9-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 5-8-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $470.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000333CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREWS, ROY VAN