This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:14:41 (UTC).

USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK VS RANDALL, MA MA KRISFHEA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RANDALL, MA MA KRISFHEA. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MA KRISFHEA

STONECHASE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIA

RANDALL, MA MA KRISFHEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

02/26/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

02/26/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STONECHASE HOMEOWNERS 12-2-19

02/25/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STONECHASE HOMEOWNERS 12-2-19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MA KRISFHEA JUDELI RANDALL - EMAILED

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MA KRISFHEA JUDELI RANDALL - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO STONECHASE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC c/o REALTY MASTERS - EMAILED

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO STONECHASE HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC c/o REALTY MASTERS - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MA KRISFHEA JUDELI RANDALL - EMAILED

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MA KRISFHEA JUDELI RANDALL - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED proposed

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED proposed

SUMMONS ISSUED proposed

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED proposed

SUMMONS ISSUED proposed

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED proposed

LIS PENDENS

11/20/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/20/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MA KRISFHEA JUDELI RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $935.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019052030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $935.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000867CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less