This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 08/25/2022 at 14:47:07 (UTC).

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA VS HOLLEY KLESCH, JENNIFER Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOLLEY KLESCH, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIA

Defendants

LEON HOLLEY, JEFFREY

HOLLEY KLESCH, JENNIFER

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JEFFREY LEON

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JENNIFER HOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

07/26/2022:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

07/26/2022:COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

07/26/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

07/26/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

07/26/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

07/26/2022:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

07/28/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JENNIFER HOLLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JEFFREY LEON HOLLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER HOLLEY KLESCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JEFFREY LEON HOLLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $945.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022026227

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CA000505CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan