This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 10:57:01 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS MILLER, JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MILLER, JAMES. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA

TENANT, UNKNOWN

MILLER, JAMES

HAMILTON, SHELBY

MILLER, JAMES LEWIS

MILLER, JAMES L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULLER, SHANE

Defendant Attorney

ANDREWS, ROY VAN

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO CLERK

01/30/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY

01/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT

01/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED JAMES MILLER

01/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED JAMES MILLER

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

11/15/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES MILLER EMAILED TO ATTY

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES MILLER EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION EMAILED TO ATTY

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

LIS PENDENS

11/11/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED JAMES MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROY V ANDREWS UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000839CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less