This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/20/2019 at 17:09:19 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS HOLLEY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2015 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOLLEY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MCSWAIN, JOHNNY NIGEL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHNNY NIGEL

HOLLEY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT

Not Classified By Court

PHILLIPS, CHRIS

PHILLIPS, STEPHANIE

MCSWAIN, JOHNNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINTEL, HOLLAN MARIE

Defendant Attorneys

WILHELM, GREGORY BOYD

SHIPWASH, TENNILLE M.

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

02/27/2018:CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

RECEIPT

02/12/2018:RECEIPT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION PG

01/11/2018:PROOF OF PUBLICATION PG

RESPONSE FROM LARRY AND WHITNEY PERINE

07/03/2017:RESPONSE FROM LARRY AND WHITNEY PERINE

SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK EMAILED TO ATTY

03/07/2017:SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK EMAILED TO ATTY

ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE 1-31-17@11:45

01/06/2017:ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE 1-31-17@11:45

ORDER TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE HEARING

12/01/2016:ORDER TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE HEARING

AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/09/2016:AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

03/02/2016:ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

11/16/2015:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,274.70 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2018006516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • ASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,274.70 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • ASSESSMENT 4 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,274.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE US BANK NATIONAL 182,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • BID SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2015
  • VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,967.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2015050256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • PAY FINE OR FILING WITH A DUE DATE 12/16/2015 UPDATED WITH COMPLIANCE ACTION OF SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,967.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,967.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • CASE 572015CA000961CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLEY BY THE SEA IMPROVEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILHELM, GREGORY BOYD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shipwash, Tennille M