This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/06/2019 at 10:08:17 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS CARRELL, CHRISTOPHER CLAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CARRELL, CHRISTOPHER CLAY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CARRELL, CHRISTOPHER CLAY

THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLU

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPA

CARRELL, STEPHANIE

EAGLE CREEK HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCI

Not Classified By Court

CARRELL, CHRISTOPHER AKA CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLUB EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLUB EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER CARRELL (EMAILED)

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER CARRELL (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED EAGLE CREEK HOMEOWNERS (EMAILED)

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED EAGLE CREEK HOMEOWNERS (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED STEPHANIE CARRELL (EMAILED)

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED STEPHANIE CARRELL (EMAILED)

NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL

05/21/2019:NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL

06/11/2019:NOTICE FOR NON JURY TRIAL

RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/31/2020:RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

LETTER TO CLERK

05/11/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANTS REQUESTING HIS EMAIL ADDRESS BE ADDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketNOTICE DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER CARRELL AND STEPHANIE CARRELL'S RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketLETTER TO RECORD LIS PENDENS WITH CHECK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUEST CLUB 1-23-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED STAPHANIE CARRELL 1/23/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED EAGLE CREEK HOMEOWNER'S ASSOC. INC. 1/22/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 1/22/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019002759

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,955.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000032CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLU is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan