This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 06/21/2019 at 14:22:19 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A VS HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION FKA B Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION FKA B. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRON ELAINE

HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION FKA B

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

NORRIS, MYRON ELAINE

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTE, ANGELA MARIA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/28/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

05/28/2019:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED MYRON ELAINE NORRIS EMAILED TO ATTY

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MYRON ELAINE NORRIS EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRON ELAIINE NORRIS EMIALED TO ATTY

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRON ELAIINE NORRIS EMIALED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION F/K/A BENEFICIAL FLORIDA INC. EMAILED TO ATTY

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION F/K/A BENEFICIAL FLORIDA INC. EMAILED TO ATTY

LETTER TO CLERK TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

06/03/2019:LETTER TO CLERK TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

LETTER TO CLERK - RECORD LIS PENDENS - SUSPENDED TRANSACTION # 836665 - RETURNED FROM ATTORNEY WITH ADDITIONAL PAYMENT

06/17/2019:LETTER TO CLERK - RECORD LIS PENDENS - SUSPENDED TRANSACTION # 836665 - RETURNED FROM ATTORNEY WITH ADDITIONAL PAYMENT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DARA LEWIS 2/6/20

02/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DARA LEWIS 2/6/20

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHANNON LAMBERT 12/06/19

02/24/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHANNON LAMBERT 12/06/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

07/08/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED MYRON NORRIS

07/08/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED MYRON NORRIS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK - RECORD LIS PENDENS - SUSPENDED TRANSACTION # 836665 - RETURNED FROM ATTORNEY WITH ADDITIONAL PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT - LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK TO RECORD LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION F/K/A BENEFICIAL FLORIDA INC. EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MYRON ELAIINE NORRIS EMIALED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MYRON ELAINE NORRIS EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019024040

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000410CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pette, Angela Maria