This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 10:59:03 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA US DE VS HUSKEY, DANALYNN N Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA US DE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HUSKEY, DANALYNN N. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA US DE

Defendants

SANTA ROSA COUNTY

HUSKEY, DANALYNN N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, FREDERICK JOHN

Defendant Attorney

ANDREWS, ROY VAN

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA SAM PARKER CHAIR OF SRC 11/21/19

07/31/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA SAM PARKER CHAIR OF SRC 11/21/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED DANALYNN N. HUSKEY 11/21/19

07/31/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED DANALYNN N. HUSKEY 11/21/19

LETTER TO CLERK

11/19/2019:LETTER TO CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED DANALYNN N. HUSKEY EMAILED TO ATTY

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DANALYNN N. HUSKEY EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FLORIDA EMAILED TO ATTY

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY, FLORIDA EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

LIS PENDENS

11/11/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA SAM PARKER CHAIR OF SRC 11/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED DANALYNN N. HUSKEY 11/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DANALYNN HUSKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF SUSPENDED TRANSACTION RETURNED TO US WITH APPROPRIATE FEE FORWARDED TO RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ROY V ANDREWS UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DANALYNN N. HUSKEY EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $925.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000838CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less