Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/22/2019 at 16:31:51 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS ALLISON, KATHRYN D

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLISON, KATHRYN D. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, JOSE A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, JOSE A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

ALLISON, KATHRYN D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER, JONATHAN ROBERT

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KATHRYN ALLISON 7-8-19

07/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KATHRYN ALLISON 7-8-19

SUMMONS ISSUED KATHRYN ALLISON (EMAILED)

06/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KATHRYN ALLISON (EMAILED)

SUMMONS PROPOSED

06/28/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KATHRYN ALLISON 7-8-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED KATHRYN ALLISON (EMAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/17/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019029028

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $185.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • CASE 572019SC001424SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event Date: 09/17/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Singer, Jonathan Robert, ESQ.