This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 12/10/2020 at 14:28:05 (UTC).

THE MOORS GOLF & RACQUET CLUB VS ASENCIO, ANDRES Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 THE MOORS GOLF RACQUET CLUB filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASENCIO, ANDRES. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE MOORS GOLF & RACQUET CLUB

Defendants

ASENCIO, ANDRES

ASENCIO, EVELYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, JOHN HARDY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/11/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

11/11/2020:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANDRES ASENCIO

11/16/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANDRES ASENCIO

SUMMONS ISSUED TO EVELYN ASENCIO

11/16/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO EVELYN ASENCIO

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ANDRES ASENCIO 11/20/20

11/23/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ANDRES ASENCIO 11/20/20

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED EVELYN ASENCIO 11/20/20

11/23/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED EVELYN ASENCIO 11/20/20

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED EVELYN ASENCIO 11/20/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ANDRES ASENCIO 11/20/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO EVELYN ASENCIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO ANDRES ASENCIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $434.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020039940

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $434.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $434.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CA000516CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, JOHN HARDY