This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 05/13/2019 at 14:21:00 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING I Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING I. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL MIEL

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING I

MIELLO, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

04/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

04/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

04/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

04/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

LIS PENDENS

04/19/2019:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL MIELLO EMAILED TO ATTY

04/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL MIELLO EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL MIELLO EMAILED ATTY

04/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL MIELLO EMAILED ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

04/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

04/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

COMPLAINT

04/19/2019:COMPLAINT

VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

04/19/2019:VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

05/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

05/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED SUB MICHAEL MIELLO 5/23/19

05/29/2019:PROOF OF SERVICE SERVED SUB MICHAEL MIELLO 5/23/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL MIELLO NKA EVANGELINE MIELLO ON 05/23/19

06/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL MIELLO NKA EVANGELINE MIELLO ON 05/23/19

MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

06/27/2019:MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

08/01/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL MIELLO EMAILED ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL MIELLO EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,945.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019018119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,945.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000310CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vanslette, Jason Michael