This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/07/2019 at 04:04:39 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FK VS ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FK

Defendants

TENANT #1, UNKNOWN

TENANT #2, UNKNOWN

MERS, INC., AS NOMINEE FOR FIR

HOHN, GLORIA M

HOHN, RICHARD W

ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC

Not Classified By Court

HOHN, RICHARD WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

LINDSAY, ALLEN WELDON

 

Court Documents

VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

02/11/2019:VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

02/11/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED GLORIA HOHN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED GLORIA HOHN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED MERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MERS INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED RICHARD HOHN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED RICHARD HOHN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FORECLOSURE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ALLEN W LINDSAY JR UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: ALLEN W LINDSAY JR UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED CORP MERS INC 2-22-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED NONSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED SUB UNKNOWN TENANT ONE NKA RICHARD HOHN FATHER 2-13-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED RICAHRD HOHN 2-13-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED SUB RICHARD HOHN 2-13-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC 2-13-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,970.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019006570

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,970.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,970.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000111CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 2/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDSAY, ALLEN WELDON JR