This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/06/2019 at 10:07:21 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FK VS AMANDA L. HARRIS, UNKNOWN SPOU Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AMANDA L HARRIS, UNKNOWN SPOU. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FK

Defendants

TENANT #1, UNKNOWN

BERKELEY FOREST HOMEOWNERS ASS

TENANT #2, UNKNOWN

HARRIS, AMANDA L

HARRIS, STEPHEN W

AMANDA L. HARRIS, UNKNOWN SPOU

STEPHEN W. HARRIS, UNKNOWN SPO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELUCA, ORLANDO

Defendant Attorney

HEATH, JAMES LOUIS

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

01/18/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED AMANDA HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED AMANDA HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED BERELEY FOREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED BERELEY FOREST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED STEPHEN HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED STEPHEN HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMANDA HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AMANDA HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOSUE OD STEPHEN HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOSUE OD STEPHEN HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/28/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

01/18/2019:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

01/18/2019:LIS PENDENS

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

03/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF AMANDA L. HARRIS

03/05/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF AMANDA L. HARRIS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF AMANDA L. HARRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED AMANDA L. HARRIS 2/6/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF STEPHEN W. HARRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED STEVEN W. HARRIS 2/6/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: JAMES HEATH UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: JAMES HEATH UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOSUE OD STEPHEN HARRIS EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $980.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019002941

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $980.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $980.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000037CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKELEY FOREST HOMEOWNERS ASS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATH, JAMES LOUIS