This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 09/23/2019 at 18:39:00 (UTC).

TARASHIKA, ALFORD RENEE VS CHANGE, NAME

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 TARASHIKA, ALFORD RENEE filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against CHANGE, NAME. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SIMON JR, JOHN F and SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SIMON JR, JOHN F

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TARASHIKA, ALFORD RENEE

ALFORD, TARASHIKA RENEE

Respondent

CHANGE, NAME

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • REPORT OF LEGAL CHANGE OF NAME, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH OFFICE OF VITAL STATISTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • NAME CHANGE REPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • AMENDED PETITON FOR CHANGE OF NAME-TARSHIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $3.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019039990

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $3.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $3.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • LETTER TO MS. ALFORD FROM KAY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)-TARASHIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET-TARASHIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $405.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019038972

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $405.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $405.50 BALANCE REMAINING $405.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $405.50 BALANCE REMAINING $405.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • CASE 572019DR001478DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 8/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • JUDGE: SIMON JR, JOHN F ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less