This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 16:52:48 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS JACKSON, JAMES M

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACKSON, JAMES M. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GIRAUD, TONY and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MICHELLE INERE

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

JACKSON, JAMES M

Milton, FL 32583-9312

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

07/26/2022:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

07/26/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/27/2022 13:30; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED JAMES JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAMES M JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/27/2022 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING at 1:30 pm cst

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $185.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022026205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022SC001416SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Synchrony Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J