This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/30/2020 at 12:18:30 (UTC).

STEWART, DARLA JANE VS STEWART, RODNEY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2016 STEWART, DARLA JANE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEWART, RODNEY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SIMON JR, JOHN F, RIMMER, DAVID, DAVID RIMMER, MILLER, JOHN L, JOHN MILLER and SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SIMON JR, JOHN F

RIMMER, DAVID

DAVID RIMMER

MILLER, JOHN L

JOHN MILLER

SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEWART, DARLA JANE

Respondent

STEWART, RODNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ANDERSON, KATHLEEN ELLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESTRUCTION X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDCA E-FILINGS DOCUMENTS - STIPULATED ORDER ON 1D19-016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDCA E-FILINGS DOCUMENTS - ORDER ON REMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketORDER ON REMAND AND JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketANSWER BRIEF- DARLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - DARLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketORDER AS TO ATTORNEYS FEE REMAND, STIPULATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW FROM JANE BREHANY TO JUDGE SIMON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS- DARLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: JILL W WARREN UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
411 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK - COVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $425.00 BALANCE REMAINING $425.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketJUDGE: MAGISTRATE , MICHELE INERE ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketPAY FINE OR FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketATTORNEY: KATHLEEN E ANDERSON UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • DocketCASE 572013DR001513DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/17/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON, KATHLEEN E