This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/20/2019 at 14:09:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF VS ANDREWS, EVELYN R Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2015 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ANDREWS, EVELYN R. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RIMMER, DAVID, SIMON, JOHN F JR, DICKEY, DARLENE and DAVID RIMMER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RIMMER, DAVID

SIMON, JOHN F JR

DICKEY, DARLENE

DAVID RIMMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

Defendants

TAYLOR, SCARLET

ANDREWS, EVELYN R

WERNICKE, JULIA S

SANTA ROSA COUNTY TAX COLLECTO

FALBO'S FAMILY KARATE, INC.

DUCE, COZINE B

WOLFE, ROGETTE W

TAYLOR, ELISA M

JONES, MELANIE

WETLAND SCIENCES, INC. F/K/A C

BLEDSOE, KATHLEEN A

GULF ISLAND TRADERS, INC.

SANTA ROSA COUNTY CLERK, TAX C

SKILLQ, INC

DUCE, HAROLD E

LOGISTICS BY MAJOR, LLC

ANDREWS, GERALD E

WETLAND SCIENCES, INC., A FL C

REGIONS BANK, AN AL BANKING CO

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITSITT, SHIRLEY JEANNE

Defendant Attorneys

LINDSAY, HEATHER FISHER

FIXEL, WILLIAM ARTHUR

LUKIS, ASHLEY HOFFMAN

Other Attorneys

ANDREWS, ROY VAN

HAWKINS, CARY DALE

 

Court Documents

MOTION AND NOTICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

10/04/2018:MOTION AND NOTICE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

07/26/2017:CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

RECEIPT

09/13/2016:RECEIPT

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

07/28/2016:ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

PROPOSED ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

07/27/2016:PROPOSED ORDER CANCELLING HEARING

MOTION FOR CANCELLATION OF HEARING

07/27/2016:MOTION FOR CANCELLATION OF HEARING

CHECK NUMBER 4422 TO FIXEL AND WILLIS TRUST ACCT FOR 206, 500.00 MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL

06/20/2016:CHECK NUMBER 4422 TO FIXEL AND WILLIS TRUST ACCT FOR 206, 500.00 MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK PARCEL 800

06/16/2016:CERTIFICATE OF CLERK PARCEL 800

RECEIPT

06/16/2016:RECEIPT

FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO THE INTEREST OF FALBO'S FAMILY KARATE INC PARCEL 800

05/23/2016:FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO THE INTEREST OF FALBO'S FAMILY KARATE INC PARCEL 800

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS PARCEL 800 SENT TO REGISTRY RELIEF

05/16/2016:ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF FUNDS PARCEL 800 SENT TO REGISTRY RELIEF

RECEIPT

02/26/2016:RECEIPT

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

02/26/2016:CERTIFICATE OF CLERK

STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISBURSEMENT SENT TO REG. RELEASE 2-15-16

02/15/2016:STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISBURSEMENT SENT TO REG. RELEASE 2-15-16

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

02/12/2016:MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

CHECK NUMBER 4321 TO LINDSAY AND LINDSAY FOR 18,048.70 MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL

02/10/2016:CHECK NUMBER 4321 TO LINDSAY AND LINDSAY FOR 18,048.70 MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL

MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS OWNED FOR TAXES AS TO PARCELS 128 & 142

01/28/2016:MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF FUNDS OWNED FOR TAXES AS TO PARCELS 128 & 142

RECEIPT

11/05/2015:RECEIPT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • MOTION TO STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • SCARLETT A TAYLOR AND CHANEL E TAYLOR MOTION TO STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Update Event LACK OF PROSECUTION on 12/6/2018 1000 AM Judge DAVID RIMMER results 11/27/2018 on CANCEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • ANSWER - FROM DEFENDANT SCARLETT A. TAYLOR AND CHANEL E TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVING ASWERS TO INTERROGATORIES SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM RESPONDENT BRIDGESTONE RETAIL OPERATIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FROM RESPONDENT BRIDGESTONE RETAIL OPERATIONS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE - SKILLQ INC - JEFF HARRIS REGISTERED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
330 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • CASE STATUS SET TO CASE OPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: Fixel, William A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: Fixel, William A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: HOFFMAN, ASHLEY ELAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: Fixel, William A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: Fixel, William A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: ANDREWS, ROY V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: LINDSAY, HEATHER F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: LINDSAY, HEATHER F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Event Date: 12/06/2018 10:00; Judge: RIMMER, DAVID; Docket Type: LACK OF PROSECUTION; Location: MX JC - CHAMBERS; Defendant Attorney: Fixel, William A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREWS, ROY VAN