This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:14:14 (UTC).

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC VS FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST H Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST H. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

WYATT, PETER CHARLES

JOYCE ELIZABETH WYATT A/K/A JO

FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST H

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorneys

RUMORE, C ANTHONY

DREY, KATHRYN WILBURN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - VIA ZOOM

05/08/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS PETER CHARLES WYATT and JOYCE ELIZABERTH WYATT

03/16/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS PETER CHARLES WYATT and JOYCE ELIZABERTH WYATT

NOTICE OF ACTION

02/10/2020:NOTICE OF ACTION

LETTER TO CLERK

02/07/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

01/29/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED JOYCE WYATT

01/29/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED JOYCE WYATT

COMPLAINT

11/13/2019:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. INC 11/21/19

11/25/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST HOMEOWNERS ASSOC. INC 11/21/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ON 11/20/19

11/22/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY-INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ON 11/20/19

SUMMONS ISSUED FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST EMAILED TO ATTY

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT EAST EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE ELIZABETH WYATT EMAILED TO ATTY

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JOYCE ELIZABETH WYATT EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED PETER CHARLES WYATT EMAILED TO ATTY

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PETER CHARLES WYATT EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED TO ATTY

11/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

LIS PENDENS

11/13/2019:LIS PENDENS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY SCOTT MITCHELL FOR DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK ON FAIRWAYS AT TIGER POINT HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: C ANTHONY RUMORE PA UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: C ANTHONY RUMORE PA UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $945.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019050858

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $945.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000843CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less