This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/25/2019 at 18:31:02 (UTC).

SMITH, JEFFREY A. VS SMITH, SHANNON T

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 SMITH, JEFFREY A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SMITH, SHANNON T. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE, SIMON JR, JOHN F and SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE

SIMON JR, JOHN F

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, JEFFREY A.

Respondent

SMITH, SHANNON T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RYBA, GAYLE JUGUILON

Respondent Attorney

KEENE, LAURA E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF - SHANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - JERRREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • ANSWER TO COUNTER PETITION FPR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIGINAL OR ENFORCEMENT PROCEEDINGS- SHANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF LAURA KEENE OBO SHANNON SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - SHANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • ANSWER TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF- SHANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • COUNTER PETITION - INITIAL PLEADING FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- SHANNON

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $425.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES - JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage AND OTHER RELIEFVERIFIED- JEFFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • LETTER TO THE CLERKS FOR SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $425.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • CASE 572019DR001044DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less