This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/24/2021 at 16:53:36 (UTC).

SAYLORS, JAMES VS LAWRENCE, JIM

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 SAYLORS, JAMES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LAWRENCE, JIM. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAYLORS, JAMES

Defendant

LAWRENCE, JIM

Not Classified By Court

SAYLORS, JAMES RAMSEY

LAWRENCE, JIM LANE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JIM LAWRENCE WITH PRETRIAL HEARING DATE OF 01/07/2022 AT 9:00 AM CST

11/24/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JIM LAWRENCE WITH PRETRIAL HEARING DATE OF 01/07/2022 AT 9:00 AM CST

RECEIPT

11/24/2021:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/07/2022 09:00; Judge: 1, MEDIATOR; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE ZOOM H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF HAND DELIVERY OVER COUNTER SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $188.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021043947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $188.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 1/7/2022 - JUDGE MEDIATOR 1 PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JIM LAWRENCE WITH PRETRIAL HEARING DATE OF 01/07/2022 AT 9:00 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $188.50 BALANCE REMAINING $188.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021SC002786SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less