This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 06/26/2019 at 14:21:50 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTG VS DAMIAN DOLATA AKA DAMIAN PAUL Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAMIAN DOLATA AKA DAMIAN PAUL. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK DBA REGIONS MORTG

Defendants

DAMIAN DOLATA AKA DAMIAN PAUL

DOLATA, HEATHER

STOWELL, KEITH

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN TENANT 1,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSIDY, TAYLOR NICOLE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/03/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

06/03/2019:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED DAMIAN DOLATA EMAILED TO ATTY

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED DAMIAN DOLATA EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 (EMAILED)

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

06/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HEATHER DOLATA - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

06/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HEATHER DOLATA - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

06/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT 1 KEITH STOWELL

06/20/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT 1 KEITH STOWELL

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED DAMIAN DOLATA

07/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED DAMIAN DOLATA

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED HEATHER DOLATA

07/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED HEATHER DOLATA

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT 1 KEITH STOWELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HEATHER DOLATA - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2 (EMAILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 (EMAILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED DAMIAN DOLATA EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $945.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019024813

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $945.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000426CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/3/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR N CASSIDY