This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:09:16 (UTC).

RAWLS, IMOGENE VS COMMANDER, TIMOTHY ADAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 RAWLS, IMOGENE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COMMANDER, TIMOTHY ADAM. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DICKEY, DARLENE F and DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DICKEY, DARLENE F

DICKEY, DARLENE FALLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAWLS, IMOGENE

Defendants

COMMANDER, TIMOTHY RAY

COMMANDER, TIMOTHY ADAM

Not Classified By Court

HOLT, EDMUND W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ADAMS, JOHN HARDY

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HOLT, EDMUND WHYTE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/25/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIMOTHY RAY COMMANDER 3/14/20

03/19/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIMOTHY RAY COMMANDER 3/14/20

RETURN OF SERVICE TIMOTHY ADAM COMMANDER 3/18/20

03/19/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE TIMOTHY ADAM COMMANDER 3/18/20

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

11/21/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TIMOTHY A COMMANDER (EMAILED)

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TIMOTHY A COMMANDER (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TIMOTHY RAY COMMANDER EMAILED TO ATTY

11/19/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TIMOTHY RAY COMMANDER EMAILED TO ATTY

LIS PENDENS

11/18/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketREPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: JOHN H ADAMS UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: JOHN H ADAMS UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIMOTHY RAY COMMANDER 3/14/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TIMOTHY ADAM COMMANDER 3/18/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FINAL ACCTG/DISCHARGE FOR SERVICE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBITS TO PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $434.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000857CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less