This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 05/31/2019 at 14:21:08 (UTC).

QUICKEN LOANS INC. VS HUNNICUTT, JACK Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 QUICKEN LOANS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HUNNICUTT, JACK. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUICKEN LOANS INC.

Defendants

HUNNICUTT, JACK

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN MILTON

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF PATRICIA ALE

HUNNICUTT, MARTHA

S&G ENTERPRISES, LLC

ROBERTS, ASHLEY HUNNICUTT BARK

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK DAWSON

HUNNICUTT, JOHN J

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPA

HUNNICUTT, PATRICIA

REGIONS BANK

ROBERTS, PHILLIP CRAIG

WILLIAMS, JEFFERY

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ASHLEY,

OF MARTHA ALLISON HUNNICUT, UN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING REGIONS BANK'S MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS SALE FUNDS HELD IN COURT REGISTRY (SENT TO REGISTRY RELEASE 7-15-20 BL)

06/29/2020:ORDER GRANTING REGIONS BANK'S MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS SALE FUNDS HELD IN COURT REGISTRY (SENT TO REGISTRY RELEASE 7-15-20 BL)

DEFENDANT REGIONS BANK'S MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS SALE FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRY

02/10/2020:DEFENDANT REGIONS BANK'S MOTION TO DISBURSE SURPLUS SALE FUNDS IN COURT REGISTRY

AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE AND OWING IN SUPPORT OF REGIONS BANK

02/10/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE AND OWING IN SUPPORT OF REGIONS BANK

RECEIPT

02/03/2020:RECEIPT

NOTICE OF HEARING 6/24/20 10:15 a.m.

06/03/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING 6/24/20 10:15 a.m.

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/12/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SENT TO FINANCE -MEE

02/13/2020:CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT SENT TO FINANCE -MEE

RECEIPT

06/09/2020:RECEIPT

ASSIGNMENT OF BID

01/28/2020:ASSIGNMENT OF BID

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE PATRICIA HUNNICUTT 5-15-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED PATRICIA STRICKLAND 5-15-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ASHLEY ROBERTS 5-14-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ASHLEY ROBERTS 5-14-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED S & G ENTERPRISES LLC 05/09/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARTHA ALLISON HUNNICUTT ON 05/14/19 N/K/A JEFFERY WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ON MARTHA ALLISON HUNNICUTT ON 5/14/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE NONSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK HUNNICUTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUB JACK DAWSON HUNNICUTT 5-13-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED SERVED CORP UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 5-10-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $2,055.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019020892

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $2,055.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $2,055.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000357CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/7/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S & G ENTERPRISES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Quicken Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan