This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:12:07 (UTC).

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS DAVIS, MARIANNE CECILE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVIS, MARIANNE CECILE. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSIO

DAVIS, MARIANNE CECILE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIANNE CEC

DAVIS, DONALD PAUL

Not Classified By Court

UNKNOWN TENANT 1,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSALER, BRIAN LEE

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/11/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE SALE DATE 3/19/20

02/19/2020:NOTICE OF SALE SALE DATE 3/19/20

FINAL JUDGMENT 27,809.01

02/17/2020:FINAL JUDGMENT 27,809.01

NOTICE OF HEARING 2/17/20

01/15/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING 2/17/20

COMPLAINT

11/19/2019:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED MARIANNE DAVIS 11-30-19

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED MARIANNE DAVIS 11-30-19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 - EMAILED

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARIANNE CECILE DAVIS A/K/A MARIANNE C. DAVIS A/K/A MARIANNE GLOFF F/K/A MARIANNE DAVIS A/K/A MARIANNE CECILE GLOFF - EMAILED

11/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARIANNE CECILE DAVIS A/K/A MARIANNE C. DAVIS A/K/A MARIANNE GLOFF F/K/A MARIANNE DAVIS A/K/A MARIANNE CECILE GLOFF - EMAILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/19/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

LIS PENDENS

11/19/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/19/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER CANCELING FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $50.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020022217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 TOTAL ASSESSED $50.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketREOPENED FOR REOPEN OTHER CIVIL ON 6/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketReopen Date: 06/12/2020; Reopen Close Date: 06/18/2020; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $420.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $420.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000862CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less