This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 11/13/2021 at 19:39:08 (UTC).

PLANET HOME LENDING LLC VS HEAD, CHRISTOPHER LEE Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 PLANET HOME LENDING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HEAD, CHRISTOPHER LEE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLANET HOME LENDING LLC

Defendants

HEAD, CHRISTOPHER LEE

POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROP

HEAD, HEATHER

MICHAEL D HEAD, UNKNOWN SPOUS

HEAD, MICHAEL D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORZILLO, CINDY WOLPER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

04/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

04/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

04/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

04/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

04/08/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED HEATHER HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

04/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED HEATHER HEAD EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY EMAILED TO ATTY

04/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF SUBJECT PROPERTY EMAILED TO ATTY

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED HEATHER HEAD

06/21/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED HEATHER HEAD

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED CHRISTOPHER LEE HEAD ON 04/13/19

05/17/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED CHRISTOPHER LEE HEAD ON 04/13/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL D HEAD

05/17/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL D HEAD

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED - UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

05/17/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED - UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED MICHAEL D HEAD ON 04/13/19

05/17/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED MICHAEL D HEAD ON 04/13/19

LETTER TO CLERK NOTICE OF ACTION

07/15/2019:LETTER TO CLERK NOTICE OF ACTION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION - TO HEATHER HEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT AS TO CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED HEATHER HEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED CHRISTOPHER LEE HEAD ON 04/13/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019016236

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $955.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000274CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/4/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROP is a litigant

Latest cases where Planet Home Lending is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORZILLO CINDY WOLPER