This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 10/08/2022 at 14:10:00 (UTC).

PHILLIPS, RACHIEL VS WHALEY, DEREK Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 PHILLIPS, RACHIEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WHALEY, DEREK. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PHILLIPS, RACHIEL

Defendants

WHALEY, DEREK

WHALEY, HANNAH

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

09/09/2022:RECEIPT

EVICTION COMPLAINT

09/09/2022:EVICTION COMPLAINT

RESPONSE TO EVICTION SUMMONS HANNAH WHALEY

09/19/2022:RESPONSE TO EVICTION SUMMONS HANNAH WHALEY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEREK J WHALEY CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

09/20/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEREK J WHALEY CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

LETTER TO JUDGE WITH ATTACHMENTS

09/20/2022:LETTER TO JUDGE WITH ATTACHMENTS

RESPONSE (SECOND) TO HANNAH WHALEY'S ANSWER

09/27/2022:RESPONSE (SECOND) TO HANNAH WHALEY'S ANSWER

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEREK WHALEY

09/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEREK WHALEY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HANNAH WHALEY

09/09/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED TO HANNAH WHALEY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING EVICTION

09/09/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING EVICTION

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED HANNAH WHALEY ON 09/12/2022

09/14/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED HANNAH WHALEY ON 09/12/2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DEREK J WHALEY BY SUBSTITUTE ON 09/12/2022

09/16/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DEREK J WHALEY BY SUBSTITUTE ON 09/12/2022

CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AFTER DEFAULT

10/03/2022:CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AFTER DEFAULT

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK

10/03/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK

CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

10/03/2022:CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AFTER DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND RESPONSE TO HANNAH WHALEY'S ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE WITH ATTACHMENTS-RESPONSE TO ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEREK J WHALEY CLERKS DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO EVICTION SUMMONS HANNAH WHALEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DEREK J WHALEY BY SUBSTITUTE ON 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED HANNAH WHALEY ON 09/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO HANNAH WHALEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEREK WHALEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $205.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022031766

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001755CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/9/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less