This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/20/2019 at 17:02:14 (UTC).

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS AARON, ANGELA M Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AARON, ANGELA M. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

AARON, ANGELA M

ADMINISTRATOR OF THE SMALL BUS

THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLU

CDC CAPITIAL INVESTMENTS AS TR

OWEN FRANKLIN HOSKINS AKA OWEN

LAMBERT, SHON ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRAVIESO, JENNIFER

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH, COREY J

ADAMS, JOHN HARDY

KING, FRANCIS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

06/27/2017:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

06/21/2017:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

06/21/2017:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

06/21/2017:RECEIPT

APPEAL BILLING/INDEX/PROGRESS DOCKET MAILED. *NOTE: FILING FEE NOT PAID*

05/16/2017:APPEAL BILLING/INDEX/PROGRESS DOCKET MAILED. *NOTE: FILING FEE NOT PAID*

FINAL JUDGMENT 912, 821.66 GRANTED BY JUDGE

04/17/2017:FINAL JUDGMENT 912, 821.66 GRANTED BY JUDGE

PROPOSED ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

03/16/2017:PROPOSED ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL

ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF GRANTED BY JUDGE

02/22/2017:ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF GRANTED BY JUDGE

MOTION TO CONTINUE NON JURY TRIAL

02/21/2017:MOTION TO CONTINUE NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

02/20/2017:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY

02/06/2017:NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/10/2016:DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/10/2016:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

COMPLAINT

11/09/2015:COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • CHECK OR MONEY ORDER ACCEPTED FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $13.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2017029585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • ASSESSMENT 5 TOTAL ASSESSED $13.50 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • ASSESSMENT 5 ASSESSED AT SUM $13.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • ASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $2,346.40 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2015
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,980.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2015049108

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • PAY FINE OR FILING WITH A DUE DATE 12/9/2015 UPDATED WITH COMPLIANCE ACTION OF SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,980.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,980.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • CASE 572015CA000940CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/9/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MOORS GOLF AND RACQUET CLU is a litigant

Latest cases where CDC CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC AS TRUSTEE is a litigant

Latest cases where PEN AIR FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where ADMINISTRATOR SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION UNITED STATES AM is a litigant