This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 14:04:46 (UTC).

PEARSON, BRANDON, PEARSON, DIANNE C Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PEARSON, BRANDON, PEARSON, DIANNE C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN, ROSS MATHEW

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

PEARSON, TAYLOR AUSTIN

PEARSON, ERIC

PEARSON, DIANNE C

PEARSON, BRANDON

Decedent

PEARSON, PAUL EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WHITE, KATHLYN MONROE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY-9-15-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - SUMMATION WEEKLY 03/18/20 & 03/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $5.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020013426

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 TOTAL ASSESSED $5.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020004948

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $400.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - INTESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CP000040CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, KATHLYN MONROE