This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:12:34 (UTC).

OPENED ISSUE IN LPS - NTRID VS PULLUM, MICHELLE ANNETTE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 OPENED ISSUE IN LPS - NTRID filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PULLUM, MICHELLE ANNETTE. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPENED ISSUE IN LPS - NTRID

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

PULLUM, MICHELLE ANNETTE

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN, LINDSAY BRAKEFIELD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING 8/3/20 9:30 A.M. CST

04/21/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING 8/3/20 9:30 A.M. CST

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

04/20/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING 5/15/20 9 AM CST

01/27/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING 5/15/20 9 AM CST

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2

12/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN PARTY #2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY #1

12/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED ON UNKNOWN PARTY #1

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO MICHELLE PULLUM, ET AL ON 12/05/19

12/16/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO MICHELLE PULLUM, ET AL ON 12/05/19

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY #2 EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTY #1 EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHELLE PULLUM EMAILED TO ATTY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED MICHELLE PULLUM EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

11/14/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 8/3/20 9:30 A.M. CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 5/15/20 9 AM CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $935.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019051055

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $935.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000847CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less