Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 14:14:35 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC VS LISCO, JOHN L

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LISCO, JOHN L. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC

Defendant

LISCO, JOHN L

Not Classified By Court

LISCO, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOHN LISCO 01/06/20

01/10/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOHN LISCO 01/06/20

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN LISCO

12/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN LISCO

SUMMONS PROPOSED

12/31/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/31/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRECORDED ORDER RATIFYING STIPULATION AND CLOSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOHN LISCO 01/06/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHN LISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019057522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CC003005CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 12/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III