This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 03/20/2019 at 16:36:05 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS COSTANZO, KIMBERLEY ANN Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2015 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COSTANZO, KIMBERLEY ANN. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SIMON, JOHN F JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SIMON, JOHN F JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIMBERLEY AN

IRWIN, WILLIAM L.

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM L. I

COSTANZO, KIMBERLEY ANN

HAWK'S NEST PROPERTY OWNERS AS

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

REGIONS BANK

Not Classified By Court

IRWIN, KIMBERLEY A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

Defendant Attorneys

WARRICK, K SCOTT

MASSEY, STARLETT M

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

08/24/2016:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

08/24/2016:RECEIPT

RECEIPT

08/24/2016:RECEIPT

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

07/13/2016:ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE

BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT

04/22/2016:BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

04/22/2016:NOTICE OF FILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

03/25/2016:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ASSIGNMENT OF BID

03/21/2016:ASSIGNMENT OF BID

NOTICE OF SALE 04-22-16

03/15/2016:NOTICE OF SALE 04-22-16

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

03/07/2016:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

FINAL JUDGMENT 208, 972.94

03/02/2016:FINAL JUDGMENT 208, 972.94

COMPLAINT

10/25/2015:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED MAILED TO SHAPIRO FISHMAN & GACHE LLP 4630 WOODLAND CORP BLVD SUITE 100 TAMPA FL 33614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $70.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2016037550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • ASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $70.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • ASSESSMENT 4 ASSESSED AT SUM $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $70.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2016037529

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • ASSESSMENT 3 TOTAL ASSESSED $70.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2015
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $992.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2015
  • CASE 572015CA000897CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 10/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • Reopen Date: 07/11/2016; Reopen Close Date: 07/13/2016; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WARRICK, K SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Massey, Starlett M