This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:14:54 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR VS IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTI Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTI. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA MR

Defendants

WIECZORKOWSKI, ROBERT JOSEPH

WIECZORKOWSKI, ROBERT J J

IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN PARTI

IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTI

WIECZORKOWSKI, JENNIFER LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

CONCILIO, AMY LORRAINE

 

Court Documents

ENVELOPE

02/25/2020:ENVELOPE

DEFENDANT - JENNIFER WIECZORKOWSKI'S RESPONSE

02/25/2020:DEFENDANT - JENNIFER WIECZORKOWSKI'S RESPONSE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/04/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 2

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 2

SUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER LYNN WIECZORKOWSKI

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JENNIFER LYNN WIECZORKOWSKI

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 1

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 1

SUMMONS ISSUED ROBERT J WIECZORKOWSKI JR

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ROBERT J WIECZORKOWSKI JR

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

LIS PENDENS

11/21/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/21/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT OR EXHIBITS TO PLEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTED ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT - JENNIFER WIECZORKOWSKI'S RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: Amy Concilio UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,945.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019052163

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,945.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000869CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less