This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 03/18/2019 at 14:21:26 (UTC).

NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION AN VS BROWN, KIM F Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION AN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BROWN, KIM F. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION AN

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM F BROWN

BROWN, KIM F

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Not Classified By Court

BROWN, KIM FRANCINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

02/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM BORWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM BORWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

COMPLAINT

02/22/2019:COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT#2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM F. BROWN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED KIM F. BROWN 3/01/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM BROWN EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT ONE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT TWO EMAILED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (proposed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000141CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 2/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ullman, Zachary Y.