This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court on 04/19/2019 at 14:20:47 (UTC).

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP VS HOOSE, TERESA L Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 MTGLQ INVESTORS LP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOOSE, TERESA L. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County - First Judicial Circuit Court, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DUNCAN, J SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTGLQ INVESTORS LP

Defendants

TERESA L HOOSE, UNKNOWN SPOUSE

HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION

TENANT1, UNKNOWN

TENANT2, UNKNOWN

HOOSE, TERESA L

Not Classified By Court

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSIDY, TAYLOR NICOLE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

03/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

SUMMONS ISSUED TERESA I HOOSE

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TERESA I HOOSE

SUMMONS ISSUED HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA L HOOSE

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA L HOOSE

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

04/02/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA L HOOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TERESA I HOOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019014171

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $955.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000231CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 3/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORP. OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where MTGLQ Investors, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR N CASSIDY