This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 19:25:37 (UTC).

MORROW, JOHNNY LEE VS FLORIDA DEPT.OF HIGHWAY SAFETY Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 MORROW, JOHNNY LEE filed an Other lawsuit against FLORIDA DEPT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORROW, JOHNNY LEE

Defendants

FLORIDA DEPT.OF HIGHWAY SAFETY

UNIVERSITY FORD

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

06/10/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

RECEIPT

05/04/2020:RECEIPT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • DocketCIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $300.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020017894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $300.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CC000893CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less