This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 16:15:53 (UTC).

MORRIS, CHRISTOPHER VS JUNG, KRISTEN

Case Summary

On 08/27/2010 MORRIS, CHRISTOPHER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JUNG, KRISTEN. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GOODMAN, MARCI L, RIMMER, DAVID, DAVID RIMMER, GOODMAN, MARCI LEVIN and GOODMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GOODMAN, MARCI L

RIMMER, DAVID

DAVID RIMMER

GOODMAN, MARCI LEVIN

GOODMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS, CHRISTOPHER

Respondent

JUNG, KRISTEN

Not Classified By Court

LYLES, KRISTEN JUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOLMAN, JUSTIN T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER ON FORMER HUSBAND'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND/OR ENFORCEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 11/05/2020 @2PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 11/05/2020 @ 2PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING /ZOOM MEETING SCHEDULED FOR 11-10-2020 @ 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketORDER ON VERIFIED MOTION FOR CONTEMPT AND/OR ENFORCEMENT - HEARING REQUIRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AND RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KRISTEN JUNG 07/07/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: STEVEN WARRICK UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE - STEVEN WARRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
174 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KRISTEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT CHRISTOPHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER CHRISTOPHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CHILD CUSTODY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketPETITION FOR DOM WITH CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2010
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE GOODMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLMAN, JUSTIN THOMAS