Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/29/2020 at 14:15:04 (UTC).

MOOREFIELD, KATHRYN VS GALE, JAMES T.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 MOOREFIELD, KATHRYN filed an Other lawsuit against GALE, JAMES T. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOOREFIELD, KATHRYN

Defendant

GALE, JAMES T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADAMS, JOHN HARDY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES GALE 08/11/20

08/18/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES GALE 08/11/20

COMPLAINT

07/30/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMES GALE

07/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMES GALE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/30/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES GALE 08/11/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO JAMES GALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $317.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020027916

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $317.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $317.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CC001267CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 7/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, JOHN HARDY