This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:13:28 (UTC).

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST VS COZART, TIFFANY D Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COZART, TIFFANY D. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST

Defendants

COZART, TIFFANY D

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RAND

COZART, WILLIAM RANDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARFIELD, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RANDALL

01/22/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RANDALL

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIFFANY D COZART 12/24/19

01/22/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIFFANY D COZART 12/24/19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM RANDALL COZART 12/7/19

01/22/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM RANDALL COZART 12/7/19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM RANDALL COZART a/k/a WILLIAM R. COZART a/k/a WILLIAM COZART a/k/a RANDY COZART - SENT TO ATTORNEY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM RANDALL COZART a/k/a WILLIAM R. COZART a/k/a WILLIAM COZART a/k/a RANDY COZART - SENT TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RANDALL COZART EMAILED TO ATTY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RANDALL COZART EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY D COZART EMAILED TO ATTY

11/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY D COZART EMAILED TO ATTY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

11/13/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

LIS PENDENS

11/13/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RANDALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TIFFANY D COZART 12/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM RANDALL COZART 12/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK TO RECORD DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM RANDALL COZART a/k/a WILLIAM R. COZART a/k/a WILLIAM COZART a/k/a RANDY COZART - SENT TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM RANDALL COZART EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TIFFANY D COZART EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $935.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019050951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $935.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000845CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less