This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:10:14 (UTC).

MIDWEST LOAN SOLUTIONS INC VS HARDY, JEREMY S Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 MIDWEST LOAN SOLUTIONS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HARDY, JEREMY S. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDWEST LOAN SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

HARDY, ROBYN K

IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENAN

HARDY, JEREMY S

IN POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENAN

Not Classified By Court

HARDY, JEREMY SCOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY-GRANTED

03/27/2020:ORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY-GRANTED

NOTICE OF ACTION - TO JEREMY S. HARDY A/K/A JEREMY HARDY

03/05/2020:NOTICE OF ACTION - TO JEREMY S. HARDY A/K/A JEREMY HARDY

LETTER TO CLERK

03/05/2020:LETTER TO CLERK

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

02/17/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

02/03/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

02/03/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO ROBYN K. HARDY ON 12/10/19

12/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO ROBYN K. HARDY ON 12/10/19

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

12/02/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - EMAILED

11/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 - EMAILED

11/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1 - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY S HARDY A/K/A JEREMY HARDY - EMAILED

11/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO JEREMY S HARDY A/K/A JEREMY HARDY - EMAILED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBYN K. HARDY - EMAILED

11/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBYN K. HARDY - EMAILED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/22/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/22/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/22/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/22/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

LIS PENDENS

11/22/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY-GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION-NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO/FOR STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - TO JEREMY S. HARDY A/K/A JEREMY HARDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $1,945.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019052401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $1,945.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000874CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less