Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/19/2019 at 16:32:29 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MELLON, KEITH

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MELLON, KEITH. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MELLON, KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, ASHLEY LENEE

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KEITH MELLON ON 07/06/19

07/06/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KEITH MELLON ON 07/06/19

SUMMONS ISSUED KEITH MELLON (EMAILED)

06/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED KEITH MELLON (EMAILED)

SUMMONS PROPOSED

06/27/2019:SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO KEITH MELLON ON 07/06/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED KEITH MELLON (EMAILED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • EVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/17/2019 - JUDGE MICHELE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019029027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • JUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • CASE 572019SC001423SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Event Date: 09/17/2019 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: MX 217

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L