Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 13:45:05 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS MULLERY, KELLY

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed an Other lawsuit against MULLERY, KELLY. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

MULLERY, KELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KELLY MULLERY 12-31-19

01/02/2020:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KELLY MULLERY 12-31-19

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

12/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

12/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

SUMMONS (proposed)

12/20/2019:SUMMONS (proposed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/20/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/20/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketLETTER TO KELLY MULLERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketANSWER FROM KELLY MULLERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KELLY MULLERY 12-31-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MULLERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019056542

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (proposed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CC002937CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI