Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 05/15/2021 at 17:18:33 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS LETO, CHRISTOPHER P

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LETO, CHRISTOPHER P. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

MICHELLE INERE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

LETO, CHRISTOPHER P

Milton, FL 32570-1510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER P LETO

04/28/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER P LETO

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/15/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

04/15/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/02/2021 09:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER P LETO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 11/2/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021015655

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021SC001075SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA