Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 05/15/2021 at 17:19:14 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS KIRN, STEPHEN M

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIRN, STEPHEN M. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT and MICHELLE INERE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

MICHELLE INERE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

KIRN, STEPHEN M

Milton, FL 32571-6307

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED STEPHEN M KIRN PT 9/14/21

04/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED STEPHEN M KIRN PT 9/14/21

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

04/15/2021:SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 09/14/2021 14:00; Judge: MAGISTRATE, MICHELLE INERE; Docket Type: SC PRE TRIAL CONFER; Location: SANTA ROSA COUNTY COURTHOUSE VIDEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED STEPHEN M KIRN PT 9/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEVENT SCHEDULED ON 9/14/2021 - JUDGE MICHELLE INERE MAGISTRATE PRESIDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE TO APPEAR/SUMMONS PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021015648

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021SC001071SCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 4/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN