This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:11:55 (UTC).

MIDFIRST BANK VS ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 MIDFIRST BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDFIRST BANK

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF COY C. HARRI

HARRIS, COY C J

ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorney

ENGVALSON, KINLEY I

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

05/27/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING 6/8/2020

05/01/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING 6/8/2020

NOTICE OF SALE

04/08/2020:NOTICE OF SALE

CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

02/25/2020:CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/22/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/22/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER FILED BY COY HARRIS

12/02/2019:ANSWER FILED BY COY HARRIS

COMPLAINT

11/13/2019:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF COY C. HARRIS, JR NKA JOANNE HARRIS ON 11/21/19

11/22/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF COY C. HARRIS, JR NKA JOANNE HARRIS ON 11/21/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO COY C. HARRIS, JR ON 11/21/19

11/22/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO COY C. HARRIS, JR ON 11/21/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC c/o MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC ON 11/18/19

11/21/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED TO ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC c/o MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC ON 11/18/19

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF COY HARRIS JR

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF COY HARRIS JR

SUMMONS ISSUED COY HARRIS (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED COY HARRIS (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC (EMAILED)

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC (EMAILED)

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

11/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED PROPOSED

LIS PENDENS

11/13/2019:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 6/8/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF FORECLOSURE SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $140.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020015319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $140.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketREOPENED FOR REOPEN OTHER CIVIL ON 4/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $935.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019050839

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $935.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000842CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less