This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/07/2022 at 14:14:36 (UTC).

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVIC VS MEEKS, JAMES

Case Summary

On 06/08/2022 MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVIC filed an Other lawsuit against MEEKS, JAMES. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVIC

Defendant

MEEKS, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA JO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/08/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

06/08/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES MEEKS SERVED 06/20/22

06/23/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES MEEKS SERVED 06/20/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANT JAMES MEEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES MEEKS SERVED 06/20/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED JAMES MEEKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $310.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022020391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $310.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC001052CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 6/8/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J