This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 06/13/2022 at 14:09:00 (UTC).

MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF VS FRISBEY, RICHARD C

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRISBEY, RICHARD C. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GIRAUD, TONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GIRAUD, TONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF

Defendant

FRISBEY, RICHARD C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORSILLO, STEPHEN A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

05/17/2022:ORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED RICHARD C FRISBEY

05/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED RICHARD C FRISBEY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED RICHARD C. FRISBEY 5/31/22

06/07/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED RICHARD C. FRISBEY 5/31/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED RICHARD C. FRISBEY 5/31/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED RICHARD C FRISBEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2022017599

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $410.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCASE 572022CC000916CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 5/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ORSILLO STEPHEN