This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 06/08/2022 at 04:42:16 (UTC).

MCCARTNEY, JONPAUL E, MCCARTNEY, KIMBERLY D Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 MCCARTNEY, JONPAUL E, MCCARTNEY, KIMBERLY D was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CLARK, LACEY POWELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

 

Party Details

Interested Party

MCCARTNEY, KIMBERLY D

Decedent

MCCARTNEY, WALTER E

Not Classified By Court

MCCARTNEY, JONPAUL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MATTHEWS, EDSEL FORD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCP RECORDED ORDER - ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITORS CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - SUMMATION WEEKLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY) - WALTER E. MCCARTNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - TESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $400.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2021034080

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $400.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCASE 572021CP000425CPAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less