Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 07/16/2020 at 14:00:03 (UTC).

MARSAGLIA, ANGELA CHRISTINE Et Al VS NAME CHANGE,

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 MARSAGLIA, ANGELA CHRISTINE filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against NAME CHANGE. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR. and SIMON JR, JOHN F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SIMON, JOHN FRANKLIN JR.

SIMON JR, JOHN F

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MARSAGLIA, BRIAN ANTHONY

MARSAGLIA, ANGELA CHRISTINE

Respondent

NAME CHANGE,

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF LEGAL CHANGE OF NAME-STATE OF FLORIDA, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, OFFICE OF VITAL STATISTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT-NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $8.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020006420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 TOTAL ASSESSED $8.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD(REN))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL ON 06/11/20 @ 9:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE ON FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CHANGE OF NAME MINOR CHILD(REN))- ANGELA AND BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS- ANGELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD(REN))- ANGELA AND BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketBIRTH CERTIFICATE COPY B.A.D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- ANGELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $402.00 BALANCE REMAINING $402.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020DR000108DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: SIMON JR, JOHN F ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less