This case was last updated from First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County on 08/20/2020 at 12:10:55 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC VS IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENAN. This case was filed in First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DUNCAN, J SCOTT and DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    First Circuit Courts - Santa Rosa County

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DUNCAN, J SCOTT

DUNCAN, JAMES SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA

OF JERRETT W LYNCH, UNKNOWN SP

POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN TENANT I

IN POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN TENAN

LYNCH, JERRETT W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH, KELLEY LOUISE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

05/19/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING 5/18/20 11:20 A.M. CST

03/03/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING 5/18/20 11:20 A.M. CST

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 11-30-19

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT 1 11-30-19

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY 12-6-19

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SANTA ROSA COUNTY 12-6-19

RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JERRETT LYNCH

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JERRETT LYNCH

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JERRETT LYNCH 11-30-19

12/09/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JERRETT LYNCH 11-30-19

LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

12/02/2019:LETTER TO CLERK : RECORD LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED SANTA ROSA COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JERRETT W LYNCH

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JERRETT W LYNCH

SUMMONS ISSUED JERRETT W LYNCH

11/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED JERRETT W LYNCH

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

11/21/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK proposed

LIS PENDENS

11/21/2019:LIS PENDENS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 5/18/20 11:20 A.M. CST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DOCUMENTS - NOTE AND MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2 DISMISSED 1/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketUNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JERRETT W LYNCH DISMISSED 1/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $955.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2019052200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 TOTAL ASSESSED $955.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $955.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketATTORNEY: UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketCASE 572019CA000870CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 11/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less