This case was last updated from Santa Rosa County Courts on 09/15/2020 at 14:09:14 (UTC).

KNEIB, CECILIA VS BROSCH, NICKALAS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 KNEIB, CECILIA filed an Other lawsuit against BROSCH, NICKALAS. This case was filed in Santa Rosa County Courts, Santa Rosa County Courthouse located in Santa Rosa, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Rosa County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Rosa County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Rosa, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILLIARD, CLAUDE ROBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNEIB, CECILIA

Defendants

BROSCH, STEVEN

BROSCH, NICKALAS

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT

09/03/2020:RECEIPT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVEN BROSCH

08/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO STEVEN BROSCH

SUMMONS ISSUED TO NICKALAS BROSCH

08/20/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED TO NICKALAS BROSCH

Collection Department Partial Pay Agreement

08/20/2020:Collection Department Partial Pay Agreement

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED: $50.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 2020032096

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 TOTAL ASSESSED $300.00 BALANCE REMAINING $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 TOTAL ASSESSED $20.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $25.00 BALANCE REMAINING $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STEVEN BROSCH 08/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCollection Department Partial Pay Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 TOTAL ASSESSED $25.00 BALANCE REMAINING $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 4 ASSESSED AT SUM $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 TOTAL ASSESSED $20.00 BALANCE REMAINING $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketJUDGE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCASE 572020CC001357CCAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 8/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less